RI S2248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Senate Commission To Study Municipal Shared Services
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Senate Commission To Study Municipal Shared Services
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Connors [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] |
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2248.pdf |