RI S2248 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a financial incentive for business entities to create new jobs by offering a business tax reduction
Title
Rhode Island New Qualified Jobs Incentive Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] |
Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2248.pdf |