RI S2249 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Safety And Health Programs For Fire Departments (would Require That Fire Depts Comply With The 1987 Version Of The Standards On Fire Department Occupational Safety And Health Programs/provide A Written Plan Of Implementation To The State Fire Marshal By January 1, 2013.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Safety And Health Programs For Fire Departments (would Require That Fire Depts Comply With The 1987 Version Of The Standards On Fire Department Occupational Safety And Health Programs/provide A Written Plan Of Implementation To The State Fire Marshal By January 1, 2013.)
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Beatrice Lanzi [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2012-04-12 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/12/2012) | |
2012-04-10 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-04-05 | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2012) | |
2012-03-13 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-08 | Scheduled for hearing (03/13/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2249.pdf |