RI S2249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends from twenty (20) days to thirty (30) days, the period of time that a newly purchased motor vehicle may be temporarily operated, using the purchaser's current licenses plates.
Title
Transfer Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-13 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2022) |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |