RI S2268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of restraints on pregnant prisoners during transport to and from court proceedings by sheriffs and/or incarceration at the ACI with annual reports to the general assembly effective January 1, 2019.
Title
The Healthy Pregnancies For Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |