RI S2274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a tax credit for electronic vehicle manufacturers capped at 6% based upon the aggregate amount of new employment during each taxable year commencing July 1, 2014
Title
Electronic Vehicle Manufacturing Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2274.pdf |