RI S2277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protects individuals from internet disclosure of personally identifiable information by commercial websites/online service operators and creates right of action for violations.
Title
Rhode Island Right-to-know Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2277.pdf |