RI S2307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- LITTER CONTROL AND RECYCLING - Changes the fine for any person convicted of a first violation of this chapter from $85 to $200, and increases the period of time that the violator may be ordered to pick up litter.
Title
Changes the fine for any person convicted of a first violation of this chapter from $85 to $200, and increases the period of time that the violator may be ordered to pick up litter.
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2307.pdf |