RI S2309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM - Prohibits contractors and subcontractors from paying employees the cash equivalent of any applicable healthcare benefit in lieu of actually purchasing the healthcare benefit unless the employee is covered under a different healthcare plan.
Title
Prohibits contractors and subcontractors from paying employees the cash equivalent of any applicable healthcare benefit in lieu of actually purchasing the healthcare benefit unless the employee is covered under a different healthcare plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee continued |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Human Services
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2309.pdf |