RI S2312 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifically make it a misdemeanor to confine any animal in a motor vehicle if it is done in a manner that places the animal in a life or extreme health threatening situation
Title
Cruelty
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |