RI S2337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a six thousand dollars ($6,000) exemption to the motor vehicle excise tax for residents of distressed communities
Title
Motor Vehicle Tax Elimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2337.pdf |