RI S2348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- INSPECTOR GENERAL - Establishes office of inspector general which would be charged with preventing fraud and mismanagement of public funds, regardless of their source and would oversee all state programs and operations.
Title
Establishes office of inspector general which would be charged with preventing fraud and mismanagement of public funds, regardless of their source and would oversee all state programs and operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2348.pdf |