RI S2355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the RI coastal adaptation trust fund. The trust would enable cities and towns and the state to apply for grants to fund projects that invest in measures that adapt infrastructure on public lands to address the impacts of climate change.
Title
The Climate Change Coastal Adaptation Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2355.pdf |