RI S2362 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of the Providence Preservation Society.
Title
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of the Providence Preservation Society.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2362.pdf |