RI S2378 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES ACT - Requires the department of health to amend its rules and regulations that allow for DEA-registered pharmacies to transfer electronic prescriptions at a patient's request.
Title
Requires the department of health to amend its rules and regulations that allow for DEA-registered pharmacies to transfer electronic prescriptions at a patient's request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |