RI S2383 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Historian Laureate Of Rhode Island (would Establish The Position Of Historian Laureate In Ri.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Historian Laureate Of Rhode Island (would Establish The Position Of Historian Laureate In Ri.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-04-05 | Scheduled for consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2012-03-07 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2012) | |
2012-02-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2012) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2383.pdf |