RI S2398 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designate calamari as the official state appetizer
Title
State Emblems
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Dawson Hodgson [R] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |