RI S2399 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Credit Unions (would Permit Credit Unions To Conduct Savings Promotion Raffles)
Title
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Credit Unions (would Permit Credit Unions To Conduct Savings Promotion Raffles)
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2010-05-27 | Senate passed Sub A as amended | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Committee heard | |
2010-03-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2399.pdf |