RI S2402 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires managed care organizations to consult with the EOHHS to develop incentives for nursing facilities that demonstrate lower direct care staff turnover.
Title
Long-term Managed Care Arrangements
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |