RI S2424 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes MV dealers to issue guaranteed asset protection waivers consumers along with consumer protections for waivers effective 1/1/17.
Title
Guaranteed Asset Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-13 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |