RI S2464 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OPEN MEETINGS - Provides that public meetings involving collective bargaining agreements of school teachers shall be open to the public.
Title
Provides that public meetings involving collective bargaining agreements of school teachers shall be open to the public.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2464.pdf |