RI S2465 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- CORRECTIONS STAFFING - Establishes parameters for staffing of correctional officers.
Title
Establishes parameters for staffing of correctional officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |