RI S2472 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset/discontinue the Jobs Development Act rate reduction as of July 1, 2018.
Title
Jobs Development Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2472.pdf |