RI S2472 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- GENERAL PROVISIONS - Amends the current law on workers' compensation to require any person who is considered an independent contractor to file annually with the director of labor and training and removes the requirement that the form be in writing.
Title
Amends the current law on workers' compensation to require any person who is considered an independent contractor to file annually with the director of labor and training and removes the requirement that the form be in writing.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-04 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-01 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Labor And Labor Relations
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- GENERAL PROVISIONS
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- GENERAL PROVISIONS