RI S2485 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts retired police officers from the seventy-five (75) day rule which restricts employment for retirement purposes, when they work private details for a nongovernmental entity.
Title
Retirement Of Municipal Employees - Reemployment Of Police Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |