RI S2487 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to House Committee on Small Business
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to House Committee on Small Business
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- MANUFACTURING AND WHOLESALE LICENSES - Prohibits manufacturers of alcoholic beverages from holding or having any interest in a wholesaler license.
Title
Prohibits manufacturers of alcoholic beverages from holding or having any interest in a wholesaler license.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | House | Referred to House Committee on Small Business |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |