RI S2489 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS -- LENDERS AND LOAN BROKERS - Removes the licensing exemption for a lender that originates six (6) loans or less in twelve (12) consecutive months.
Title
Removes the licensing exemption for a lender that originates six (6) loans or less in twelve (12) consecutive months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |