RI S2503 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the civil penalty for the first and second offenses for driving without a license or driving with a suspended license, and would make a third violation a civil offense and a fourth offense a misdemeanor punishable by a fine.
Title
Suspension And Revocation Of Licenses--violations
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |