RI S2511 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES - Provides that gift certificates issued by state-chartered institutions of higher education would be exempt from the provisions of the gift certificate statute relating to expiration, escheatment, reissuance and refund.
Title
Provides that gift certificates issued by state-chartered institutions of higher education would be exempt from the provisions of the gift certificate statute relating to expiration, escheatment, reissuance and refund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-29 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2024) |
2024-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2024) |
2024-05-15 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2024) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES