RI S2521 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Ultra Low Sulfur And Biodiesel Heating Oil (would Create A New Chapter Called The Ultra Low Sulfur And Biodiesel Heating Oil Ac)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Ultra Low Sulfur And Biodiesel Heating Oil (would Create A New Chapter Called The Ultra Low Sulfur And Biodiesel Heating Oil Ac)
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Committee heard | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-24 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2521.pdf |