RI S2534 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that a notary public be a resident of Rhode Island.
Title
Notaries Public And Justices Of The Peace
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Public and justices of the peace approval of amendment lc 004546/3 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Public and justices of the peace approval of amendment lc 004546/3 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-13 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |