RI S2548 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-13 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-13 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services -- Medical Assistance (would Require Employers Who Employ Medical Assistance Beneficiaries Or Applicants To Provide The Department Of Human Services With Insurance Related Information)
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services -- Medical Assistance (would Require Employers Who Employ Medical Assistance Beneficiaries Or Applicants To Provide The Department Of Human Services With Insurance Related Information)
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-05-12 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-05 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-04-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2548.pdf |