RI S2548 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a special enrollment provision for pregnant women to obtain health insurance coverage at any time after the commencement of the pregnancy.
Title
Individual Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |