RI S2593 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- BUSINESS CORPORATION TAX - Refunds to corporations with annual gross income of less than $400 the difference between the gross annual income and the $400 minimum tax imposed with the amount refunded capped at $400.
Title
Refunds to corporations with annual gross income of less than $400 the difference between the gross annual income and the $400 minimum tax imposed with the amount refunded capped at $400.
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Anthony Deluca [R] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2593.pdf |