RI S2615 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-17 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-17 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Inspection Of Dams And Reservoirs (would Make A Number Of Procedural And Substantive Changes To The Powers Of The Department Of Environmental Management With Respect To The Inspection And Repair Of Dams And Reservoirs)
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Inspection Of Dams And Reservoirs (would Make A Number Of Procedural And Substantive Changes To The Powers Of The Department Of Environmental Management With Respect To The Inspection And Repair Of Dams And Reservoirs)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | |
2012-05-16 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-05-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2615.pdf |