RI S2615 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disqualifies certain state vendors from making political contributions, based on their business with the state.
Title
Reporting Of Political Contributions By State Vendors
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. John Pagliarini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2615.pdf |