RI S2650 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- DEPARTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS - Expands the deinstitutionalization subsidy aid program in the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals to include adoptive parent(s) or siblings(s).
Title
Expands the deinstitutionalization subsidy aid program in the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals to include adoptive parent(s) or siblings(s).
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- DEPARTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- DEPARTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2650.pdf |