RI S2655 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION ACT - Includes animal cruelty offenses to the domestic violence crimes committed by a family or household members against another.
Title
Includes animal cruelty offenses to the domestic violence crimes committed by a family or household members against another.
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2655.pdf |