RI S2669 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- INCOMPETENCY TO STAND TRIAL AND PERSONS ADJUDGED NOT GUITLY BY REASON OF INSANITY - Requires any competency examinations of criminal defendants take place on an outpatient basis or at the facility in which they are detained.
Title
Requires any competency examinations of criminal defendants take place on an outpatient basis or at the facility in which they are detained.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- INCOMPETENCY TO STAND TRIAL AND PERSONS ADJUDGED NOT GUITLY BY REASON OF INSANITY
BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES AND HOSPITALS -- INCOMPETENCY TO STAND TRIAL AND PERSONS ADJUDGED NOT GUITLY BY REASON OF INSANITY
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2669.pdf |