RI S2677 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
criminal record checks relating to those people providing educational services to very young children.
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Senate held on desk | |
2010-05-19 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2677.pdf |