RI S2692 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGISTRATION OF VEHICLES - Purchaser or lessee of vehicle that cancels registration within the period of registration, any portion of the two (2) year registration fee not used.
Title
Purchaser or lessee of vehicle that cancels registration within the period of registration, any portion of the two (2) year registration fee not used.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2692.pdf |