RI S2700 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES - Provides protection and prevent the unethical, improper conduct and the collection of fees, by anyone advising or assisting a veteran filing a claim for disability benefits with the Department of Veterans Affairs except as authorized by federal law.
Title
Provides protection and prevent the unethical, improper conduct and the collection of fees, by anyone advising or assisting a veteran filing a claim for disability benefits with the Department of Veterans Affairs except as authorized by federal law.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2700.pdf |