RI S2752 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the general treasurer submit an annual report regarding federal old-age and survivors' insurance to the general assembly.
Title
Federal Old-age And Survivors' Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |