RI S2757 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows retired police officers and firefighters to file grievances alleging that the contract under which they retired, was violated. The union has the final say on whether to pursue grievance.
Title
Arbitration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2757.pdf |