RI S2765 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a lead water supply replacement program for public and private service lines and requires disclosure to tenants and buyers of real property of the presence of lead service lines.
Title
Lead Poisoning Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |