RI S2778 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide distressed fire districts with financial assistance through the appointment of a fiscal overseer, budget commission, or receiver.
Title
Budget Commissions
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Budget commissions approval of amendment lc 005105/4 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Budget commissions approval of amendment lc 005105/3 (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Budget commissions approval of amendment lc 005105/3 (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-01 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |