RI S2781 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
THE UNIFORM COMMERCIAL CODE - Provides amendments to the Uniform Commercial Code for emerging technologies.
Title
Provides amendments to the Uniform Commercial Code for emerging technologies.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-05 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2024) |
2024-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2024) |
2024-05-17 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |