RI S2790 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corrects an erroneous statutory citation found in § 12-12-9, which inaccurately referred to § 12-9-8 (extradition), rather than the correct statute § 12-19-8 (suspension of sentence and probation by superior or district court).
Title
Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2790.pdf |