RI S2793 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsets the provision which allows first-time violators to avoid the fine by presenting proof of acquisition of a hands-free device prior to the imposition of the fine effective September 1, 2022.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2022) |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |