RI S2812 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the procedures for the holding the annual meeting/special meetings/the election/recall/duties of the board of directors/officers/tax assessor/district clerk/finance director-treasurer/tax collector/borrowing funds/installation/lighting repair.
Title
Relating To The Central Coventry Fire District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/16/2020) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2812.pdf |